Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro d’Angennes

Deceased

Archbishop of Vercelli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1781Born
17 Mar 180422.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 181736.5SelectedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
16 Mar 181836.7ConfirmedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
23 Mar 181836.7Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
25 May 183149.9SelectedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
24 Feb 183250.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
8 May 1869³87.9DiedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro d’Angennes (VIAF: 89656414)
Archbishop Alessandro d’Angennes (born , died ) Archbishop of Vercelli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 51.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 66, and Page 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast