Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Tedeschi

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (was prie/ O.P. before 1809)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1752Born
2 Jun 180957.1IncardinatedPriest
5 Oct 181967.5SelectedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
17 Dec 181967.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
19 Dec 181967.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
18 Mar 182572.9DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Tedeschi
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Tedeschi (born , died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastellaneta

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,822
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 119
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,819, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast