Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Coppola, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1758BornNapoli
7 Dec 177214.9ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
11 Mar 178022.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
23 Dec 178022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
20 Mar 181860.2SelectedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
25 May 181860.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
31 May 181860.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
20 Jun 182365.4SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nola, Italy
17 Nov 182365.8ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nola, Italy
14 Apr 182870.2DiedBishop of Nola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Coppola:
Archbishop Nicola Coppola C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Nola

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 106, and Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013