Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Tommasi

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1769Born
16 Mar 179323.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 181848.6SelectedBishop of Aversa, Italy
6 Apr 181848.6ConfirmedBishop of Aversa, Italy
12 Apr 181848.6Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
9 Nov 182152.2DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Tommasi
Bishop Agostino Tommasi (born , died ) Bishop of Aversa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,818, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast