Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Sergio

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalů, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1766Born
18 Dec 179024.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 181043.3SelectedBishop of Cefalů, Italy
19 Dec 181448.2ConfirmedBishop of Cefalů, Italy
27 Dec 181448.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalů, Italy
27 Feb 182760.3DiedBishop of Cefalů, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Sergio
Bishop Giovanni Sergio (born , died ) Bishop of Cefalů

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Stefano di Camastra

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1814, Number 14
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 145

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast