Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Francesco Guerrieri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rimini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1753BornFermo
6 Oct 178229.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 180855.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
20 Mar 180855.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
27 Sep 181966.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Rimini, Italy
12 Jan 182269.0ResignedBishop of Rimini, Italy
24 Dec 182269.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Guerrieri:
Archbishop Giovanni Francesco Guerrieri (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rimini

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 89, and Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013