Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leone Ciampa, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1782BornSerra Capriola
21 Feb 180724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
24 Jan 182946.7SelectedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
18 May 182947.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
26 May 182947.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
27 Oct 183553.5SelectedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
1 Feb 183653.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
7 Oct 184866.4SelectedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
22 Dec 184866.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
9 Sep 185472.4DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leone Ciampa:
Archbishop Leone Ciampa O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 530
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 159, and Page 321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013