Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Varrone

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1758Born
21 Dec 178224.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 181859.3SelectedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
6 Apr 181859.4ConfirmedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
12 Apr 181859.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
27 Feb 183273.3DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Varrone
Bishop Bartolomeo Varrone (born , died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Barbara

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 353
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast