Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Lucibello

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1753BornAmalphi
4 Apr 177824.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 181965.1SelectedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
29 Mar 181965.3ConfirmedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
12 Apr 181965.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
9 Mar 183682.2ResignedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
25 Jul 183682.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Lucibello:
Bishop Andrea Lucibello (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013