Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Rodrigues Vilares

Deceased

Bishop of Funchal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1745³BornSão Paulo
30 Nov 176520.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Jan 176620.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 179650.7SelectedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
24 Jul 179751.8ConfirmedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
31 Dec 179752.2Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
1810¹64.2DiedBishop of Funchal, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Rodrigues Vilares
Bishop Luis Rodrigues Vilares (born , died 1810) Bishop of Funchal

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 221
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016