Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Camillo de Carolis

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1753Born
19 Sep 177824.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 181864.4AppointedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
23 Mar 181864.5Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
13 Jun 181864.7InstalledBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
26 Aug 181864.9DiedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Camillo de Carolis
Bishop Pier Camillo de Carolis (born , died ) Bishop of CittÓ della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastignano

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 152
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,818, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast