Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rudolf Joseph von Edling

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Gorizia (Görz)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1723³BornGorizia
4 Sep 174623.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 176946.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gorizia (Görz), Italy
20 Nov 176946.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
4 Feb 177046.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
23 May 177450.8SelectedArchbishop of Gorizia (Görz), Italy
27 Jun 177450.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Gorizia (Görz), Italy
13 Aug 178461.0ResignedArchbishop of Gorizia (Görz), Italy
23 Apr 180480.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Gorizia (Görz), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rudolf Joseph von Edling:
Archbishop Rudolf Joseph von Edling (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gorizia (Görz)

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 145, and Page 227
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016