Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Maria Ficcarelli (Ficarelli)

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1780BornReggio Emilia
25 Mar 180625.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 182241.4AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
21 Apr 182241.4Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
5 Jun 182544.5DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Ficcarelli (Ficarelli):
Bishop Angelo Maria Ficcarelli (Ficarelli) (born , died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

  • a priest for 19.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013