Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Camillo Alleva

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1770BornNapoli
16 Mar 179323.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 181848.2SelectedBishop of Ugento, Italy
26 Jun 181848.3ConfirmedBishop of Ugento, Italy
28 Jun 181848.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
13 Dec 182454.8ResignedBishop of Ugento, Italy
22 Nov 182555.7SelectedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
19 Dec 182555.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
30 Oct 182959.6DiedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Alleva:
Archbishop Camillo Alleva (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno)

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1828
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 330, and Page 383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013