Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Serra Cassano

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1783BornNapoli
1 Mar 180623.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 181835.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
23 Mar 181835.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
6 Oct 181835.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
3 Jul 182643.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Capua, Italy
26 Jul 182643.4SucceededArchbishop of Capua, Italy
30 Sep 183148.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Apr 183350.2Elevated to Cardinal
15 Apr 183350.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
17 Aug 185067.5DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Serra Cassano:
Cardinal Francesco Serra Cassano (born , died ) Archbishop of Capua

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
  • a cardinal for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 132, and Page 281
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Sep 1831

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013