Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adeodato Gomez Cardosa

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1768BornNapoli
24 Sep 179122.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 181849.5SelectedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
26 Jun 181849.6ConfirmedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
28 Jun 181849.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
9 Sep 182556.8SelectedBishop of Isernia, Italy
19 Dec 182557.0ConfirmedBishop of Isernia, Italy
4 Jul 183465.6DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Adeodato Gomez Cardosa:
Bishop Adeodato Gomez Cardosa (born , died ) Bishop of Isernia

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1833
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 138, and Page 226

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013