Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Kien Samophithak

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Thare and Nonseng


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1920BornThare
4 Apr 194827.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 195938.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Thare, Thailand
12 Feb 195938.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Octaba
1 Jul 195938.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Octaba
18 Dec 196545.0AppointedArchbishop of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand
6 Mar 198059.2ResignedArchbishop of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand
16 Oct 199877.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Michael Kien Samophithak:
Archbishop Michael Kien Samophithak (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Thare and Nonseng

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013