Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Luigi Carretto, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Surat Thani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1912BornAlessandria
18 Mar 193926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
12 Apr 195138.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Rajaburi, Thailand
12 Apr 195138.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenobias
29 Jun 195139.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenobias
18 Dec 196553.5AppointedBishop of Ratburi, Thailand
26 Jun 196957.0AppointedBishop of Surat Thani, Thailand
21 Jun 198876.0RetiredBishop of Surat Thani, Thailand
16 Nov 199482.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Surat Thani, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Pietro Luigi Carretto:
Bishop Pietro Luigi Carretto S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Surat Thani

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013