Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Thienchai Samanchit

Bishop Emeritus of Chanthaburi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1931 BornHuaphai
29 Jan 195927.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chantaburi, Thailand
3 Jul 197139.6AppointedBishop of Chanthaburi, Thailand
3 Oct 197139.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chanthaburi, Thailand
4 Apr 200977.4RetiredBishop of Chanthaburi, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Thienchai Samanchit:
Bishop Lawrence Thienchai Samanchit (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Chanthaburi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chanthaburi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013