Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Yod Phimphisan, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Udon Thani, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1933Born
2 Jul 195320.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
24 Jun 195825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Oct 197542.7AppointedBishop of Udon Thani, Thailand
12 Dec 197542.8Ordained BishopBishop of Udon Thani, Thailand
14 Nov 200976.8RetiredBishop of Udon Thani, Thailand
18 Dec 201784.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Udon Thani, Thailand

MicroData Summary for George Yod Phimphisan
Bishop George Yod Phimphisan C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Udon Thani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBangkok
Death PlaceAek Udon International, Hospital, Udon Thani, Diocese of Udon Thani

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2009
  • d: CB, 18 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018