Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lawrence Khai Saen-Phon-On

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Thare and Nonseng


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1928BornBan Thung-Mon
16 Jan 195728.4Ordained PriestPriest of Thare, Thailand
6 Mar 198051.6AppointedArchbishop of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand
16 Jul 198051.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand
14 May 200475.7RetiredArchbishop of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand
24 Jul 200778.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Khai Saen-Phon-On:
Archbishop Lawrence Khai Saen-Phon-On (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Thare and Nonseng

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013