Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Thare and Nonseng

Archidioecesis Tharensis et Nonsengensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 18 December 1965
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Thailand
  • Square Kilometers: 25,477 (9,840 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, 362 Moo 2, Nongbuayai Rd., Thambon That Choengchum, Amphoe Muang, Sakon Nakhon 47000, Thailand
  • Telephone: (042)71.12.72
  • Fax: 71.20.23

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Laos
4 May 1899ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Laos (erected)
14 June 1938Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Laos Prefecture Apostolic of Vientiane e Luang-Prabang (erected)
21 December 1950Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Laos Prefecture Apostolic of Thakhek (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Thare
21 December 1950Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Laos Vicariate Apostolic of Thare
7 May 1953Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Thare Vicariate Apostolic of Ubon (erected)
7 May 1953Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Thare Prefecture Apostolic of Udonthani (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Thare and Nonseng
25 March 1960Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Thare Vicariate Apostolic of Thare and Nonseng
Archdiocese of Thare and Nonseng
18 December 1965ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Thare and Nonseng Archdiocese of Thare and Nonseng

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Laos
195024,5002727907103ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Thare
Vicariate Apostolic of Thare and Nonseng
Archdiocese of Thare and Nonseng
197025,1531,500,0001.7%24731811772ap1971
198034,9182,179,8081.6%203231,51837415ap1981
199041,9172,697,0001.6%29291,4459228ap1991
199948,2293,113,8651.5%49499849532ap2000
200048,8873,117,1791.6%47471,0409230ap2001
200149,4893,118,8651.6%51519709930ap2002
200248,9303,262,7861.5%505097810249ap2003
200349,5283,343,0771.5%525295210349ap2004
200450,0083,157,7801.6%491501,000110774ap2005
201044,0783,171,4781.4%6336666739475ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.4, 30 Dec 2012; data: 30 Dec 2012