Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Clemente Gaddi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bergamo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1901Born
18 Sep 192624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Como, Italy
24 Jun 195351.5AppointedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
6 Sep 195351.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nicosia, Italy
21 Jul 196260.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Siracusa, Italy
21 Jul 196260.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Darnis
25 Sep 196361.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Bergamo, Italy
20 May 197775.4RetiredBishop of Bergamo, Italy
7 Nov 199391.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Clemente Gaddi
Archbishop Clemente Gaddi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bergamo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMandello del Lario

  • a priest for 67.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Mar 2017