Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano Bonicelli

Archbishop Emeritus of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1924 Born
2 Aug 194722.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Bergamo, Italy
22 May 194823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
10 Jul 197550.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Albano, Italy
10 Jul 197550.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Musti
26 Aug 197550.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Musti
11 Jun 197752.4AppointedBishop of Albano, Italy
28 Oct 198156.8AppointedArchbishop of Italy, Military
28 Oct 198156.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Italica
14 Nov 198964.9AppointedArchbishop of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy
14 Jan 199065.0InstalledArchbishop of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy
23 May 200176.4RetiredArchbishop of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Bonicelli (VIAF: 31347743)
Archbishop Gaetano Bonicelli (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilminore di Scalve, Diocese of Bergamo
Ordained PriestCathedral, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • od/c0/loc: AM, 10 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Feb 2019

Quantcast