Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Servílio Conti, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Roraima, Roraima

Titular Bishop of Thuburbo Maius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1916BornVertova, Italy
8 Apr 194427.5Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
1 Jan 196548.2AppointedPrelate of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil
8 Feb 196851.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Maius
5 May 196851.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Maius
3 May 197558.5ResignedPrelate of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil
14 Sep 201497.9DiedPrelate Emeritus of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Servílio Conti:
Bishop Servílio Conti I.M.C. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Roraima

  • a priest for 70.4 years
  • a bishop for 46.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 15 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Sep 2014