Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Bonazzi

Apostolic Nuncio to Canada

Titular Archbishop of Atella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1948 BornGazzaniga, Italy
30 Jun 197325.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 199951.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Atella
19 Jun 199951.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Haiti
26 Aug 199951.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Atella
30 Mar 200455.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cuba
14 Mar 200960.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lithuania
14 Mar 200960.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Estonia
25 Mar 200960.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Latvia
18 Dec 201365.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Canada

MicroData Summary for Luigi Bonazzi:
Archbishop Luigi Bonazzi (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Canada

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Canada.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,600
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Dec 2013