Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Amadei

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bergamo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1933Born
16 Mar 195724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
21 Apr 199057.1AppointedBishop of Savona-Noli, Italy
2 Jun 199057.3Ordained BishopBishop of Savona-Noli, Italy
21 Nov 199158.7AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
26 Jan 199258.9InstalledBishop of Bergamo, Italy
22 Jan 200975.9RetiredBishop of Bergamo, Italy
29 Dec 200976.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Roberto Amadei
Bishop Roberto Amadei (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bergamo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerdello, Diocese of Bergamo
Ordained PriestSan Giovanni Chapel, Grand, Seminary, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo
Ordained BishopUnderground Chapel, Grand, Seminary, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo
Death PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo
Buried Place (Original)Bishops' Crypt, Cathedral, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2009
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,069
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,591
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • loc: AM, 23 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 25 Mar 2019

Quantcast