Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Paravisi

Deceased

Bishop of Crema, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1930Born
30 May 195322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
4 Jun 198857.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bergamo, Italy
4 Jun 198857.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Turris in Proconsulari
25 Jun 198857.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turris in Proconsulari
11 Jul 199665.8AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
6 Oct 199666.0InstalledBishop of Crema, Italy
2 Sep 200473.9DiedBishop of Crema, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Paravisi
Bishop Angelo Paravisi (born , died ) Bishop of Crema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo
Ordained BishopSantissimo Redentore, Church, Seriate, Diocese of Bergamo
Death PlaceCrema, Diocese of Crema
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Crema, Diocese of Crema

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,560
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • i/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast