Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel Gelmi Bertocchi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cochabamba

Titular Bishop of Forum Clodii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1938BornGandino
28 Jun 196830.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Apr 198546.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
4 Apr 198546.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Clodii
29 Jun 198547.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forum Clodii
31 May 201375.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
17 Jun 201678.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cochabamba, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Angel Gelmi Bertocchi
Bishop Angel Gelmi Bertocchi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cochabamba

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 May 2013
  • d: CB, 17 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Jun 2016