Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Zaffrani

Deceased

Bishop of Guastalla, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1878Born
10 Aug 190122.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 193253.9AppointedBishop of Guastalla, Italy
30 Oct 193254.0Ordained BishopBishop of Guastalla, Italy
6 May 196081.6DiedBishop of Guastalla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Zaffrani (VIAF: 89572032)
Bishop Giacomo Zaffrani (born , died ) Bishop of Guastalla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasalzuigno
Ordained BishopComo, Diocese of Como

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932, Number 80
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,980

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast