Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Renzo Fratini

Apostolic Nuncio to Spain

Titular Archbishop of Botriana

Apostolic Nuncio to Andorra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1944 BornUrbisaglia, Italy
6 Sep 196925.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Aug 199349.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Botriana
7 Aug 199349.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Pakistan
2 Oct 199349.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Botriana
8 Aug 199854.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Indonesia
24 Jun 200359.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Timor-Leste
27 Jan 200459.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nigeria
20 Aug 200965.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
20 Aug 200965.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Andorra

MicroData Summary for Renzo Fratini:
Archbishop Renzo Fratini (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Spain

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Spain.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,175

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Dec 2014