Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agustinus Agus

Archbishop of Pontianak


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1949 BornLintang
6 Jun 197727.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Oct 199950.0AppointedBishop of Sintang, Indonesia
6 Feb 200050.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sintang, Indonesia
3 Jun 201464.6AppointedArchbishop of Pontianak, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Agustinus Agus:
Archbishop Agustinus Agus (born ) Archbishop of Pontianak

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pontianak.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,695
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 3 Jun 2014