Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Amove Avenya

Bishop of Gboko, Nigeria

Apostolic Administrator of Katsina-Ala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1955 Born
30 May 198125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Makurdi, Nigeria
28 Nov 200853.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Makurdi, Nigeria
28 Nov 200853.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania
24 Jan 200953.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania
29 Dec 201257.5AppointedBishop of Gboko, Nigeria
24 Feb 201357.6InstalledBishop of Gboko, Nigeria
17 Feb 202064.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Katsina-Ala, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for William Amove Avenya
Bishop William Amove Avenya (born ) Bishop of Gboko

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIshangev Tiev
Ordained BishopApe Aku Stadium, Makurdi, Diocese of Makurdi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gboko.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,047
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2012
  • ab: CB, 19 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast