Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Javier Argüello García

Auxiliary Bishop of Valladolid, Spain

Titular Bishop of Ipagro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1953 Born
27 Aug 198633.2Ordained PriestPriest of Valladolid, Spain
14 Apr 201662.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valladolid, Spain
14 Apr 201662.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ipagro
3 Jun 201663.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ipagro

MicroData Summary for Luis Javier Argüello García
Bishop Luis Javier Argüello García (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valladolid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeneses de Campos

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Valladolid.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 Apr 2016
  • c3+: CB, 2 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 3 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,931

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018