Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Namaza Niyiring, O.S.A.

Bishop of Kano, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1960 Born
12 Jul 199232.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
20 Mar 200847.7AppointedBishop of Kano, Nigeria
13 May 200847.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kano, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for John Namaza Niyiring
Bishop John Namaza Niyiring O.S.A. (born ) Bishop of Kano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZonkwa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,741

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast