Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Xavier Novell GomÓ

Bishop Emeritus of Solsona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1969 Born
6 Jul 199728.2Ordained PriestPriest of Solsona, Spain
3 Nov 201041.5AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
12 Dec 201041.6Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
23 Aug 202152.3ResignedBishop of Solsona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Xavier Novell GomÓ (VIAF: 233230455)
Bishop Xavier Novell GomÓ (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Solsona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOssˇ de Siˇ
Ordained BishopCathedral, Solsona, Diocese of Solsona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Solsona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,873
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Aug 2021

Quantcast