Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles M. Hammawa

Bishop of Jalingo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1962 BornMapeo
4 Jul 198724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Yola, Nigeria
16 Apr 200845.5AppointedBishop of Jalingo, Nigeria
4 Jul 200845.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jalingo, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Charles M. Hammawa:
Bishop Charles M. Hammawa (born ) Bishop of Jalingo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jalingo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,928

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013