Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Ademu Adaji, M.S.P.N.

Bishop of Idah, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1964 Born
3 Dec 199430.1ProfessedMember of Missionary Society of Saint Paul of Nigeria
1 Jul 199530.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Society of Saint Paul of Nigeria
28 Jun 200742.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Idah, Nigeria
28 Jun 200742.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Turuda
22 Sep 200742.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turuda
1 Jun 200944.6AppointedBishop of Idah, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Anthony Ademu Adaji
Bishop Anthony Ademu Adaji M.S.P.N. (born ) Bishop of Idah

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUkpaba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Idah.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,516
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast