Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Herrero Fernández, O.S.A.

Bishop of Palencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1947 Born
25 Oct 196720.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
12 Jul 197023.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
22 Dec 201467.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santander, Spain
30 May 201568.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Santander, Spain
26 Apr 201669.2AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
18 Jun 201669.4Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Herrero Fernández
Bishop Manuel Herrero Fernández O.S.A. (born ) Bishop of Palencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerdio-Val de San Vicente

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palencia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2016
  • ob/c12: CB, 26 Apr 2016
  • c34: CB, 14 Jun 2016
  • c56: CB, 21 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,943

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast