Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulinus Chukwuemeka Ezeokafor

Bishop of Awka, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1952 Born
30 Jun 198431.7Ordained PriestPriest of Awka, Nigeria
20 Jan 200754.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Awka, Nigeria
20 Jan 200754.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tetci
28 Apr 200754.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tetci
8 Jul 201158.8AppointedBishop of Awka, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Paulinus Chukwuemeka Ezeokafor
Bishop Paulinus Chukwuemeka Ezeokafor (born ) Bishop of Awka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNanka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Awka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,409
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018