Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Callistus Chukwuma Valentine Onaga

Bishop of Enugu, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1958 Born
8 Aug 198728.8Ordained PriestPriest of Enugu, Nigeria
9 Feb 200950.3AppointedBishop of Enugu, Nigeria
2 May 200950.5Ordained BishopBishop of Enugu, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Callistus Chukwuma Valentine Onaga
Bishop Callistus Chukwuma Valentine Onaga (born ) Bishop of Enugu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgbudu
Ordained BishopHoly Ghost, Cathedral, Enugu, Diocese of Enugu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Enugu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,167
  • mn: CB, 14 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 1 Sep 2018

Quantcast