Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hyacinth Oroko Egbebo, M.S.P.N.

Bishop of Bomadi, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1955 Born
23 Jun 199034.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Society of Saint Paul of Nigeria
23 Nov 200752.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bomadi, Nigeria
23 Nov 200752.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacubaza
2 Feb 200852.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lacubaza
4 Apr 200953.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bomadi, Nigeria
21 Sep 201761.9AppointedBishop of Bomadi, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Hyacinth Oroko Egbebo
Bishop Hyacinth Oroko Egbebo M.S.P.N. (born ) Bishop of Bomadi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOgriagbene
Ordained BishopGrounds of Government Secondary School, Bomadi, Vicariate Apostolic of Bomadi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bomadi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,669
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 22 Sep 2017