Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julián Ruiz Martorell

Bishop of Huesca

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1957 BornCuenca
24 Oct 198124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Zaragoza, Spain
30 Dec 201053.9AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
30 Dec 201053.9AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
5 Mar 201154.1Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
6 Mar 201154.1InstalledBishop of Jaca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Julián Ruiz Martorell:
Bishop Julián Ruiz Martorell (born ) Bishop of Huesca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Huesca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,964

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013