Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ginés Ramón García Beltrán

Bishop of Getafe, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1961 Born
20 Sep 198523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Almería, Spain
3 Dec 200948.1AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
27 Feb 201048.3Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
3 Jan 201856.2AppointedBishop of Getafe, Spain
24 Feb 201856.3InstalledBishop of Getafe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ginés Ramón García Beltrán (VIAF: 311195523)
Bishop Ginés Ramón García Beltrán (born ) Bishop of Getafe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLora
Ordained BishopPlaza de las Palomas, Guadix, Diocese of Guadix

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Getafe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,576
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2018
  • i: CB, 10 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 17 Dec 2018

Quantcast