Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustine Obiora Akubeze

Archbishop of Benin City


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1956 BornKaduna
3 Oct 198731.1Ordained PriestPriest of Issele-Uku, Nigeria
14 Dec 200549.3AppointedBishop of Uromi, Nigeria
25 Feb 200649.5Ordained BishopBishop of Uromi, Nigeria
18 Mar 201154.6AppointedArchbishop of Benin City, Nigeria
28 Apr 201154.7InstalledArchbishop of Benin City, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Augustine Obiora Akubeze:
Archbishop Augustine Obiora Akubeze (born ) Archbishop of Benin City

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Benin City.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,074
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013