Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Aznárez Cobo

Auxiliary Bishop of Pamplona y Tudela

Titular Bishop of Bisuldino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1961 BornEibar (Guipúzcoa)
27 Oct 199029.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain
9 Jun 201251.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain
9 Jun 201251.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisuldino
9 Sep 201251.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisuldino

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Aznárez Cobo:
Bishop Juan Antonio Aznárez Cobo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Pamplona y Tudela

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Pamplona y Tudela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2012
  • ob/c1: CB, 9 Jun 2012
  • c2+: CB, 9 Sep 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,537

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013