Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Nigeria



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Elevated: 28 April 1976
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Mailing Address: Garki, P.M.B. 541, Abuja, Nigeria; Maitama, 6 Pope John Paul II Crescent, 900001 Abuja, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (234)703.881.5407; 810.643.9388

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Central-Western Africa
23 September 1960SplitDelegation to British Eastern and Western Africa Delegation to Eastern Africa
Delegation to Central-Western Africa
1965EstablishedDelegation to Central-Western Africa
1966EstablishedDelegation to Central-Western Africa
1967EstablishedDelegation to Central-Western Africa
26 December 1970EstablishedDelegation to Central-Western Africa Nunciature to Gambia and Sierra Leone
13 December 1973EstablishedDelegation to Central-Western Africa Delegation to Chad
Delegation to Nigeria and Ghana
17 October 1973Name ChangedDelegation to Central-Western Africa Delegation to Nigeria and Ghana
Delegation to Nigeria
Nunciature to Nigeria
28 April 1976ElevatedDelegation to Nigeria Nunciature to Nigeria

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Delegation to Nigeria and Ghana
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 65, Page 628, and Page 629
  • Nunciature to Nigeria
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 400
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 17 Jun 2024