Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gianmarco Busca

Bishop of Mantova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1965 Born
8 Jun 199125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
3 Jun 201650.5AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
11 Sep 201650.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
2 Oct 201650.8InstalledBishop of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gianmarco Busca
Bishop Gianmarco Busca (born ) Bishop of Mantova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEdolo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Brescia, Diocese of Brescia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mantova.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 9 Jun 2016
  • c2: CB, 24 Jun 2016
  • c34: CB, 6 Sep 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast