Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ovidio Vezzoli

Bishop of Fidenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1956 Born
14 Jun 198024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
17 Mar 201761.2AppointedBishop of Fidenza, Italy
2 Jul 201761.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fidenza, Italy
16 Jul 201761.5InstalledBishop of Fidenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ovidio Vezzoli (VIAF: 190343947)
Bishop Ovidio Vezzoli (born ) Bishop of Fidenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdro
Ordained PriestCathedral, Brescia, Diocese of Brescia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Brescia, Diocese of Brescia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fidenza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 28 Mar 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,456

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast