Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vigilio Mario Olmi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brescia, Italy

Titular Bishop of Gunugus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1927Born
25 Jun 195022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
20 Mar 198658.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brescia, Italy
20 Mar 198658.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gunugus
18 May 198658.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gunugus
25 Mar 200375.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brescia, Italy
25 Jan 201991.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vigilio Mario Olmi
Bishop Vigilio Mario Olmi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoccaglio, Diocese of Brescia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Brescia, Diocese of Brescia
Death PlaceBrescia, Diocese of Brescia
Buried Place (Original)Chiari, Diocese of Brescia

  • a priest for 68.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,144
  • d: CB, 25 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Feb 2019

Quantcast